DC PR23-0424 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Resolution R23-0174, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9769
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Resolution R23-0174, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9769
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-436-A Modification 2 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and GW Medical Faculty Inc Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-436-A Modification 2 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and GW Medical Faculty Inc Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Council | Resolution R23-0174, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9769 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0174 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |