DC PR23-0421 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Resolution R23-0212, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12643
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Resolution R23-0212, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12643
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0212, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12643 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0212 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |