DC PR23-0398 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Resolution R23-0206, Effective from Oct 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12861
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Resolution R23-0206, Effective from Oct 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12861
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mayor's Council on Physical Fitness, Health, and Nutrition Katrina Owens Appointment Resolution of 2019
Title
Mayor's Council on Physical Fitness, Health, and Nutrition Katrina Owens Appointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Council | Resolution R23-0206, Effective from Oct 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12861 |
2019-10-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0206 |
2019-09-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0398 |
2019-07-02 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0398 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |