DC PR23-0344 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Resolution R23-0167, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 10508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Rafi Aliya Crocket Confirmation Resolution of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control Board Rafi Aliya Crocket Confirmation Resolution of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16CouncilResolution R23-0167, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 10508
2019-07-09CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0167
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-07-01CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-07-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0344
2019-06-19CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0344 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-05-30CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback