DC PR23-0318 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Resolution R23-0169, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8283
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Resolution R23-0169, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8283
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles Gabriel T. Robinson Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles Gabriel T. Robinson Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Council | Resolution R23-0169, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8283 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0169 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0318 |
2019-06-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0318 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |