DC PR23-0297 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0102, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0102, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Award and Modifications to Human Care Agreement OAG-FY18-H-0007A and award of Human Care Agreement DCCB-2019-H-0007 with National Association for the Advancement of Returning Citizens Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Award and Modifications to Human Care Agreement OAG-FY18-H-0007A and award of Human Care Agreement DCCB-2019-H-0007 with National Association for the Advancement of Returning Citizens Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Council | Resolution R23-0102, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6793 |
2019-05-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0102 |
2019-05-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |