DC PR23-0200 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolution R23-0091, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolution R23-0091, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Edmund Burke School, Inc., Revenue Refunding Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Edmund Burke School, Inc., Revenue Refunding Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Council | Resolution R23-0091, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6108 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0091 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-05-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0200 |
2019-04-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0200 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |