DC PR23-0194 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Resolution R23-0510, Effective from Oct 02, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Resolution R23-0510, Effective from Oct 02, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council in Opposition on the Prosecution of Local Gun Offenses in Federal Court Resolution of 2019
Title
Sense of the Council in Opposition on the Prosecution of Local Gun Offenses in Federal Court Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Council | Resolution R23-0510, Effective from Oct 02, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11317 |
2020-10-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0510 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0194 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |