DC PR23-0067 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Resolution R23-0031, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Resolution R23-0031, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chancellor of the District of Columbia Public Schools Dr. Lewis D. Ferebee Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Chancellor of the District of Columbia Public Schools Dr. Lewis D. Ferebee Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Council | Resolution R23-0031, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3232 |
2019-03-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0031 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0067 |
2019-02-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0067 |
2019-02-12 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-02-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-02-06 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-01-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-01-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0067 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |