DC PR23-0003 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R23-0003, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 400
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R23-0003, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 400
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Title
General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Resolution R23-0003, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 400 |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0003 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0003 |
2019-01-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |