DC PR22-1026 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0696 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0696 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Water And Sewer Authority Board Of Directors Rev. Kendrick E. Curry Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
District Of Columbia Water And Sewer Authority Board Of Directors Rev. Kendrick E. Curry Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | Council | Resolution R22-0696 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0696 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1026 |
2018-12-11 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-12-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1026 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-09-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |