DC PR22-1017 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R22-0668 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 270
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R22-0668 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 270
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board Of Directors Judith Batty Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board Of Directors Judith Batty Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Resolution R22-0668 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 270 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1017 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0668 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-14 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-11-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1017 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-09-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |