DC PR22-0963 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Office Of Public-private Partnerships Delegation Of Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Public-private Partnerships Delegation Of Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-08-03CouncilResolution R22-0576 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8012
2018-07-10CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0576
2018-07-10CouncilFinal Reading
2018-07-10CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback