DC PR22-0960 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Resolution R22-0582 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8350
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Resolution R22-0582 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8350
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes For Fiscal Year 2019 To District Government Employee Pay Schedules Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
Changes For Fiscal Year 2019 To District Government Employee Pay Schedules Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Resolution R22-0582 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8350 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0582 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-07-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |