DC PR22-0803 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Police Complaints Board Natalie Walker Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Police Complaints Board Natalie Walker Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-04-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0803 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0803 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39894/PR22-0803-Introduction.pdf |