DC PR22-0791 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grocery Store Restrictive Covenant Prohibition Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Grocery Store Restrictive Covenant Prohibition Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-03-16 | Council | Resolution R22-0454 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2683 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0454 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |