DC PR22-0728 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0435 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Resolution R22-0435 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Tax Appeals Commission Mr. Donald Isaac, Jr. Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Real Property Tax Appeals Commission Mr. Donald Isaac, Jr. Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Resolution R22-0435 Effective from March 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2656 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0435 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0728 |
2018-02-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0728 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-01-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |