DC PR22-0518 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-13 | Council | Resolution R22-0242 Effective from October 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10202 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0242 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |