DC PR22-0449 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Resolution R22-0526 Effective from July 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Resolution R22-0526 Effective from July 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Declaring 2018 The Year Of The Anacostia Resolution Of 2017
Title
Sense Of The Council Declaring 2018 The Year Of The Anacostia Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Council | Resolution R22-0526 Effective from July 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7175 |
2018-07-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0526 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-06-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0449 |
2018-01-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0449 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |