DC PR22-0174 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Resolution R22-0060 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approve CA 22-40 Proposed multiyear contract with Vermont Energy Investment Corporation in the amount of $95,000,000 to provide performance-based services in administering required sustainable energy programs in the District of Columbia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. Doee-2016-c-0002 Approval Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-14CouncilResolution R22-0060 Effective from April 4, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3428
2017-04-04CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0060
2017-04-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-03-21CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-03-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback