DC PR22-0093 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 5/9/2017
Title
Langdon Park Moratorium Zone Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0093 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-02-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0093 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37336/PR22-0093-Introduction.pdf |