DC PR21-1058 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Resolution R21-0689 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15365
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Resolution R21-0689 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15365
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Dispensary Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Title
Medical Marijuana Dispensary Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Council | Resolution R21-0689 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15365 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0689 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |