DC PR20-1067 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-28 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-28 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Critical Infrastructure Freedom Of Information Second Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Critical Infrastructure Freedom Of Information Second Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-10-24 | Council | Resolution R20-0623 Effective from Oct 7, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11104 |
2014-10-07 | Council | PR20-1067 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary |