DC PR20-0901 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0554 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8092
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0554 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8092
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Order Nos. 001 Through 003 To Contract Dcam-12-cs-0165 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Change Order Nos. 001 Through 003 To Contract Dcam-12-cs-0165 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Council | Resolution R20-0554 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8092 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-06-23 | Council | PR20-0901 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |