DC PR20-0900 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0553 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8090
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0553 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8090
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amended And Restated Basic Ordering Agreement For Fiscal Year 2014 Dcps And Dpr Small Construction Projects (dcam-14-cs-0001e), Including Task Order No. 001, Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Amended And Restated Basic Ordering Agreement For Fiscal Year 2014 Dcps And Dpr Small Construction Projects (dcam-14-cs-0001e), Including Task Order No. 001, Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Council | Resolution R20-0553 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8090 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-06-24 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-06-18 | Council | PR20-0900 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |