DC PR20-0882 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation Board Of Directors Chris G. Gardiner Reappointment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation Board Of Directors Chris G. Gardiner Reappointment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-07-11 | Council | Resolution R20-0519 Effective from Jun 24, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6967 |
2014-06-24 | Council | PR20-0882 Introduced by Councilmember Alexander at Office of the Secretary |