DC PR20-0817 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Resolution R20-0512 Effective from Jun 24, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6952
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Resolution R20-0512 Effective from Jun 24, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6952
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Defense Fund Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2014
Title
Children's Defense Fund Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | Council | Resolution R20-0512 Effective from Jun 24, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6952 |
2014-06-24 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-06-18 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-06-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0817 |
2014-06-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0817 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-06-12 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0817 |
2014-06-06 | Council | Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-06-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2014-05-30 | Council | PR20-0817 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |