DC PR20-0789 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0548 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8082
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Resolution R20-0548 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8082
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interagency Council On Homelessness Luis Antonio Vasquez Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Interagency Council On Homelessness Luis Antonio Vasquez Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Council | Resolution R20-0548 Effective from Jul 14, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8082 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-07-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-07-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0789 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0789 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2014-05-20 | Council | PR20-0789 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |