DC CER25-0112 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Resolution ACR25-0110, Effective from Sep 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

International Wrongful Conviction Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International Wrongful Conviction Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-06CouncilResolution ACR25-0110, Effective from Sep 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013109
2023-09-19CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR25-0110
2023-09-19CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-09-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback