DC CER24-0243 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0239, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Resolution ACR24-0239, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
D.C. Elite Softball DC Grays RBI Washington Nationals Youth Academy Jenny Finch Championship Team Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
D.C. Elite Softball DC Grays RBI Washington Nationals Youth Academy Jenny Finch Championship Team Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0239, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012279 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0239 |
2022-09-20 | Council | RECONSIDERED - ALL PRESENT |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |