DC CER24-0109 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Resolution ACR24-0106, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Resolution ACR24-0106, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gottlieb Simon Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Gottlieb Simon Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0106, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012236 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0106 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |