DC CER24-0102 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Resolution ACR24-0100, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vincent A. Keane Recognition Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vincent A. Keane Recognition Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19CouncilResolution ACR24-0100, Effective from Nov 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 012224
2021-11-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR24-0100
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-11-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-29CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback