DC CER24-0060 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution ACR24-0060, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Resolution ACR24-0060, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kristy Greenwalt Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Kristy Greenwalt Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0060, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007192 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0060 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |