DC CER23-0282 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0282, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9453
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0282, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9453
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0282, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9453 |
2020-08-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0282 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-06-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |