DC CER23-0272 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution ACR23-0272, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution ACR23-0272, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Emancipation Day Establishment 15th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
District of Columbia Emancipation Day Establishment 15th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0272, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5290 |
2020-05-22 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0272 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |