DC CER23-0267 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution ACR23-0267, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5281
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution ACR23-0267, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5281
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natalie Ludaway Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Natalie Ludaway Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0267, Effective from May 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5281 |
2020-05-22 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0267 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |