DC CER23-0225 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0225, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3975
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0225, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3975
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Garland F. Pinkston, Jr. Posthumous Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Garland F. Pinkston, Jr. Posthumous Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0225, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3975 |
2020-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0225 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |