DC CER23-0221 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0221, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3969
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Resolution ACR23-0221, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3969
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Experience Unlimited Band Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Experience Unlimited Band Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0221, Effective from Apr 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3969 |
2020-04-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0221 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-12-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |