DC CER23-0175 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Resolution ACR23-0175, Effective from Feb 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Resolution ACR23-0175, Effective from Feb 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Thelma D. Jones Ceremonial Recognition of 2019
Title
Thelma D. Jones Ceremonial Recognition of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0175, Effective from Feb 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2149 |
2020-02-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0175 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |