DC CER22-0228 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Resolution ACR22-0228 Effective from February 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 853
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Myrna Sislen Recognition And Appreciation Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Myrna Sislen Recognition And Appreciation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02CouncilResolution ACR22-0228 Effective from February 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 853
2018-02-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR22-0228
2017-11-07CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-11-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2017-11-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback