DC B25-0837 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-13 - Law L25-0205, Effective from Sep 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010776, Expires on Apr 17, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-13 - Law L25-0205, Effective from Sep 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010776, Expires on Apr 17, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-13 | Council | Law L25-0205, Effective from Sep 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010776, Expires on Apr 17, 2025 |
2024-07-26 | Council | Act A25-0508 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009325 |
2024-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-07-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-07-18 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0508 |
2024-07-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024 |
2024-06-25 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0837 Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | First Reading |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |