DC B25-0791 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-791 would: (1) streamline and strengthen the truancy referral process and activate the Department of Human Services to support students and families prior to referrals to the Child and Family Services Agency or the courts; (2) enhance school discipline; and (3) establish stronger accountability. Among other things, it would require families to participate in a family rehabilitation plan created by DYRS and make any child found delinquent as a result of a crime of violence or a dangerous crime while armed ineligible for deferred disposition.
Title
Utilizing Partnerships and Local Interventions for Truancy and Safety (UPLIFT) Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0791 |
2024-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-05-13 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-05-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0791 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0791 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55199/Introduction/B25-0791-Introduction.pdf |