DC B25-0760 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0437 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004118, Expires on Jul 07, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0437 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004118, Expires on Jul 07, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Medical Cannabis Patient Card Extension and 4/20 Medical Cannabis Sales Tax Holiday Week Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Oral Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Act A25-0437 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004118, Expires on Jul 07, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0437, Expires on Jul 07, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Oral Amendment (McDuffie) |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |