DC B25-0716 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0434 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004111, Expires on Jun 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0434 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004111, Expires on Jun 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Purchase Assistance Program Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Home Purchase Assistance Program Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Act A25-0434 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004111, Expires on Jun 30, 2024 |
2024-04-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-03-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0434, Expires on Jun 30, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |