DC B25-0659 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-22 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-22 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Incentive Transparency and Accountability Act of 2024
Title
Public Incentive Transparency and Accountability Act of 2024
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-22 | Council | Public Hearing |
2024-07-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2024-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2024-01-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0659 Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2024-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0659 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54583/Introduction/B25-0659-Introduction.pdf |