DC B25-0643 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Act A25-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001452, Expires on May 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Act A25-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001452, Expires on May 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ward 8 Community Investment Fund Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024
Title
Ward 8 Community Investment Fund Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Council | Act A25-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001452, Expires on May 01, 2024 |
2024-02-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-02-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0383, Expires on May 01, 2024 |
2024-01-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |