DC B25-0636 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Act of 2023
Title
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-03-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-01-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-12-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0636 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |