DC B25-0427 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-427 would require that the Mayor satisfy certain public engagement requirements before entering into an exclusive agreement regarding the use of District owned recreational property for a term of 3 or more years. It would require that the agreement includes a provision for an annual audit to ensure compliance with the terms of the agreement, and requires a proposed resolution to the Council for review and approval, which shall include a description of the District’s current use of the District-owned recreational property among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairness in Use and Negotiation (FUN) for All Recreational Property Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2024-01-23CouncilNotice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-11-16CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0427
2023-11-15CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-09-26CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs
2023-07-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0427 Published in the DC Register
2023-07-13CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback