DC B25-0287 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 25-287 would authorize the Mayor to enter into and execute a Counseling Compact for the purpose of increasing access to licensed professional counseling. It would establish requirements for states to conduct and report adverse actions and the consequences. It would require all compact states to share licensee information with other compact states and would establish the Counseling Compact Commission. Among other things, it would provide for oversight and enforcement of the compact by participating states.
FISCAL NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Counseling Compact Approval Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2024-06-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-06-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0287 |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0287 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-05-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |