DC B25-0278 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0108, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0108, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-278 would remove the requirement that eligible students in the District of Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-19.
Title
School Student Vaccination Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Council | Law L25-0108, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001656 |
2023-12-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-12-01 | Council | Act A25-0310 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015460 |
2023-11-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-11-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0310 |
2023-11-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-10-03 | Council | Postponed to 11/7/2023 |
2023-09-19 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-09-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0278 |
2023-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0278 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |